judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOMMY J. KOLB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-1)
Case Number:06-1Case Docketed On:01/03/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TOMMY J. KOLB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TOMMY J. KOLB, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTommy J. Kolb Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 157
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/07/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/12/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant regarding number of copiesand service and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/26/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/09/2006Motion - Consolidation of appeals.MotionConsolidateFinal
02/21/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Appellant's traverse and objection to state's motion to consolidation of appeals.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/28/2006Order - Consolidating cases. Order granting motion for consolidation of appeals and Order denying requests for assistance of counsel. (06-1 consolidated into 05-291)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
03/16/2006Motion - Other. Motion for rehearing (regarding denial of appointment of counsel).MotionOtherFinal
04/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/04/2006Order - Denying motions for rehearing (denial of appointment of counsel).OrderDenyFinal
04/11/2006Order - Denying appellants' motion for case to be presented pursuant to W.R.A.P. Rule 711.OrderDenyFinal
04/11/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Appellants' objection and traverse to appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief, and appellants' motion for appellants' case to be presented pursuant to rules of appellate procedure 7.11.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/25/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/11/2006Response/Objection - Other. Received copy of appellant's response to appellee's request for designation of record on appeal filed in district court.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
05/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - reply brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/11/2006Order - Denying appellant's' request for extension to file reply brief.OrderDenyFinal
05/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/18/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/22/2006Motion - Other. Appellants' motion for rehearing due to denial of motion for extension of time to submit reply brief.MotionOtherFinal
06/15/2006Order - Other. Order denying motion to reconsider order denying motion for extension of time to file reply briefs.OrderOtherFinal
06/26/2006Service - Mail returned. Received copy of order denying motion sent to appellant "Return to Sender, no longer at this address."ServiceMail returnedFinal
06/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address. Resent order previously returned.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
08/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of addressNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
12/19/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/05/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal