Case: 05-07-00910-CR
05-07-00910-CR
07/17/2007
Sexual Assault
Hoang, Bui Quang
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/14/2008 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
04/21/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
03/20/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/22/2015 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
07/15/2009 | Mandate issued | | |
05/06/2009 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
03/09/2009 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
11/24/2008 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/14/2008 | Reply brief filed | | |
04/21/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
03/20/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
01/23/2008 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |
11/02/2007 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |
10/16/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |
09/24/2007 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
09/06/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |
08/28/2007 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/27/2007 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
08/25/2007 | Record due | | |
07/18/2007 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
07/17/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/17/2007 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/29/2007 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
04/27/2007 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/15/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John R. Roach |
Bui Quang Hoang | Criminal - Appellant | Rosa A. Eliades |
Trial Court Information
366th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Gregory T Brewer
366-82326-05
Life TDCJ