judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WENDELL MCCORKLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0759
Short Caption:WENDELL MCCORKLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-24142-09Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWendell Mccorkle Y
James W. KleinNY
Sloan S.J. JohnstonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP)
07/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (189 pgs/Shelton) 5/5/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (367 pgs/Shelton) 5/10/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (141 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/12/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (10 pgs/Shelton) 5/13/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (4 pgs/tape) 5/19/10 proc. cd attached
09/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/16/2010RECORD COPIES
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (ex parte motion--- SEALED)
09/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/27/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 25, 2011. (JAC)
01/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
01/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 90 DAYS
04/29/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant Mccorkle)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the Brief and Limited Appendix to October 17, 2011. (show cause)
08/30/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - w/waiver attached (Aplt Mccorkle)
09/13/2011FiledGranted appellant's motion to dismiss appeal.
09/13/2011FiledDismissed