judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRIS R. OLSEN v. DAVID M. KILPATRICK and NIKKI V. MALCOM, husband and wife,

Case Heading (06-190)
Case Number:06-190Case Docketed On:08/22/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Game and Fish (Title 23)
Short Title:CHRIS R. OLSEN v. DAVID M. KILPATRICK and NIKKI V. MALCOM, husband and wife,
Full Title:CHRIS R. OLSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. DAVID M. KILPATRICK and NIKKI V. MALCOM, husband and wife, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChris R. OlsenDaniel E. White
AppelleeDavid M. KilpatrickGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppelleeNikki V. MalcomGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 103
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/25/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntary for lack of subject matter jurisdictionMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/11/2006Response/Objection - Motion appellant's memorandum of points and authorities in resistance to appellees' motionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/20/2006Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
09/22/2006Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
09/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/06/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
11/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/21/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel (Lori L. Brand)MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
01/08/2007Order - Granting motion to withdraw as co-counselOrderGrantFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/17/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal; six volumes. Volumes I - IV, Original Papers; Volume V. Transcript; Volume VI, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/09/2007Order - Assignment of judge Jeffrey A. Donnell, District Judge to act in this matter (and recusing Justice Burke)OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before CJ Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill, Kite, and Donnell, DJ (Daniel E. White for appellant; Gay Woodhouse for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/28/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/16/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/18/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal