Case: 99-0964
99-0964
09/29/1999
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
MARISA S. GRENIER
SAMUEL AND COMPANY, INC., ROBERT C. SAMUEL, and THE SUNDANCE APARTMENTS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/29/1999 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | on behalf of Marisa S. Grenier | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/14/2000 | Case Stored | | | |
03/14/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | to CoA | | |
11/12/1999 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
10/12/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/11/1999 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Samual & Co., Inc., Robert C. Samual & Sundance Apartments | | |
09/29/1999 | Appendix to any instrument | attached to petition | | |
09/29/1999 | Petition for Review | on behalf of Marisa S. Grenier | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/14/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 33-E-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SAMUEL, ROBERT C. | Respondent | Mr. Harrel L. Davis III |
THE SUNDANCE APARTMENTS | Respondent | Mr. Ken K. Slavin |
SAMUEL AND COMPANY, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Bruce A. Koehler |
GRENIER, MARISA S. | Petitioner | Mr. Mike Milligan |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-98-00118-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 08-11-99
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
96-3992