Case: 06-99-00142-CR
06-99-00142-CR
09/28/1999
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Larry Thornton
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/14/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/17/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
04/18/2001 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | WRIT REFUSED | |
02/14/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
02/09/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
02/06/2001 | Motion for Extension of Time to File PDR Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/05/2001 | Inmate Standard Letter | | |
01/09/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/19/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/05/2000 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/29/2000 | Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing | | |
11/07/2000 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/02/2000 | Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing | | |
10/17/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/17/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/16/2000 | Submitted | | |
09/15/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/15/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
08/22/2000 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/21/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/21/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/18/2000 | MOTION FILED | | |
07/25/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/14/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
07/14/2000 | Brief Received (Not filed b/c excess pgs or late) | | |
07/14/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/27/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/21/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
05/16/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/15/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/26/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/26/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/27/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/27/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/14/2000 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney | Overruled | |
03/10/2000 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney | | |
02/11/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
02/10/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
01/11/2000 | Mot ext time file record disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/06/2000 | Extend time to file Record | | |
01/03/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
12/22/1999 | Order issued | | |
09/28/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/28/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Larry Thornton | Appellant | Hon. Mark W. Breding |
Thornton, Larry | Appellant | Larry Thornton |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. James H. Elliott |
Trial Court Information
202nd District Court
Bowie
Honorable Bill Peek
95-F-541-202
20 yrs TDCJ-ID