judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYMOND PAUL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-243)
Case Number:06-243Case Docketed On:10/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:RAYMOND PAUL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RAYMOND PAUL JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaymond Paul JonesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 201
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/11/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/29/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
06/11/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Dana Jill Lent.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, David E. Westling.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General and Dana Jill Lent, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Lent for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/7/08 by Michelle Lieber.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal