judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FARRELL L. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0780
Short Caption:FARRELL L. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-16847-09Filed Date:06/22/2010

Opening Event Date:06/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kathleen A. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joanne Vasco, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joanne Vasco, Esquire
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/nneded (pii))
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4 pgs/Janifer) 12/8/09 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (206 pgs/Allsion) 12/9-10/09 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (147 pgs/Maar) 12/14/09 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7 pgs/tape) 12/15/09 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (148-163 pgs/Maar) 12/16/09 proc. w/cd
10/29/2010RECORD COPIES
10/29/2010RECORD INDEX
11/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 90 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (22 pgs/tape) 6/4/10 proc. w/cd
01/05/2011NOTICE RECEIVED from aplt receipt of transcript.
01/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 15, 2010, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 90 days from the date the trancsript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/18/2011APPENDIX
03/25/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/25/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Steadman
12/22/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
01/06/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/13/2012FiledMandate