judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-102
A-102
03/18/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS
T. F. ROTHWELL, ET AL., GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/03/1944Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/17/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/29/1944Letter brief
03/18/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1944Response to Petition
05/03/1944Brief on the Merits
05/03/1944Supplement to Response
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/17/1944Response to Petition
04/12/1944sheriff's return
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/29/1944Letter brief
03/18/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
03/18/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXASRelator
Eugene de BogoryAmicus Curiae
R. F. ChapmanAmicus Curiae
D. Y. McDanielAmicus Curiae
T. F. Rothwell, et al.Respondent
Pat DoughertyAmicus Curiae
Grover Sellers, Attorney General of TexasRespondent
Great National Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and Bates, et al.Amicus Curiae
Black, Graves and StaytonAmicus Curiae
Rosser J. Coke and George Waverly BriggsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information