Case: 03-04-00257-CR
03-04-00257-CR
04/30/2004
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Pedro Estevane
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/19/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
08/15/2006 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
08/04/2006 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by court of criminal appeals | Refused | | ||||
06/28/2006 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by court of criminal appeals | Refused | | ||||
04/26/2006 | Petition for discretionary review filed in the court of criminal appeals | | |||||
04/24/2006 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
04/03/2006 | Petition for discretionary review received | | |||||
03/02/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
02/04/2005 | p/card sent to parties advising new panel | | |||||
01/31/2005 | Submitted | | |||||
01/21/2005 | Brief filed | | |||||
12/16/2004 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
12/13/2004 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
11/29/2004 | Oral argument request overruled by Court | | |||||
11/17/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/12/2004 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
10/14/2004 | Oral argument requested | | |||||
10/14/2004 | Brief filed | | |||||
09/24/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/16/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
08/20/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/17/2004 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
08/10/2004 | Trial Court Certification Missing | | |||||
07/29/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
05/17/2004 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
04/30/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/19/2006 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
09/19/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Estevane, Pedro | Criminal - Appellant | Ms. Linda Icenhauer-Ramirez |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Ronald Earle Ms. Lisa Stewart |
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable Jon N. Wisser
9010008
cnt I - 33 yrs; cnt II - 10 yrs