judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VIGIL VS. VIGIL

Case Information: 36211
Short Caption:VIGIL VS. VIGILCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A380026Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/07/2000 / Ashleman, I.R.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Victor Lee Miller--check no. 10467.
06/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09300
06/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
06/07/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: I.R. Ashleman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/25/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 9, 2000. 00-16886
10/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Parties are to notify settlement judge of status within seven days. 00-18005
11/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 5, 2000. 00-19466
03/07/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-04137
03/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-04952
04/03/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 01-05694
04/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-06320
04/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.