judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODNEY LEE SMITH v. MELISSA KAY SMITH

Case Heading (06-5)
Case Number:06-5Case Docketed On:01/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:RODNEY LEE SMITH v. MELISSA KAY SMITH
Full Title:RODNEY LEE SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. MELISSA KAY SMITH, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRodney Lee SmithChristian S. Hinckley
AppelleeMelissa Kay SmithJohn P. Worrall

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2006Motion - Other. Appellant's motion for extension of time pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.10 alternatively motion for dismissal without prejudice.MotionOtherFinal
02/21/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Faxed copy of appellee's traverse to appellant's motion for extension of time pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.10 alternatively motion for dismissal without prejudice.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/22/2006Response/Objection - Other. Original and copies of appellee's traverse.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/22/2006Order - Staying briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
03/07/2006Order - Other. Order continuing stay of briefing and order denying motion for dismissal without prejudice.OrderOtherFinal
03/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of petition for relief of judgment under W.R.C.P. 60(b) filed in district court on 3/22/06. Check status on 30 day basis.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/28/2006Event - Phone Call. Called district court clerk of check status of motion. Hearing set for 5/4/06.EventPhone CallFinal
06/05/2006Event - Phone Call. Contacted district court clerk to check status of Rule 60 motion. Hearing was rescheduled for 6/8/06.EventPhone CallFinal
11/02/2006Event - Phone Call. Called district court clerk to check status. Their file indicates that a hearing was held, but no decision letter or order was filed with the clerk.EventPhone CallFinal
11/02/2006Event - Phone Call. Attempted to contact counsel for appellant - left message on machine. Contacted John Worrall, who indicated that the case should have been voluntarily dismissed some time ago. He will speak with Mr. Hinckley and they will get it taken care of.EventPhone CallFinal
11/17/2006Event - Phone Call. Contacted John Worrall (Mr. Hinckley did not answer). Mr. Worrall indicated that he had spoken with Mr. Hinckley, but that he has still not done anything. Mr. Worrall will send a motion to dismiss.EventPhone CallFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
12/19/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/19/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal