judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS v. SOUTHWESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, KANSAS CITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AMICABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY AND TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL., GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case: A-101
A-101
03/18/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS
SOUTHWESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, KANSAS CITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AMICABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY AND TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL., GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/03/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/29/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/29/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/29/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/29/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/24/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/22/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/29/1944Letter brief
03/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Brief on the Merits
05/03/1944Brief on the Merits
05/03/1944Response to Petition
05/02/1944Response to Petition
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/29/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/29/1944Response to Brief filed
04/29/1944Response to Petition
04/29/1944Response to Petition
04/26/1944Response to Petition
04/24/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/22/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944sheriff's return
03/29/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/29/1944Letter brief
03/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
03/18/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. Y. McDaniel, County Judge, McLennan CountyAmicus Curiae
Rosser J. Coke and George Waverly BriggsAmicus Curiae
Amicable Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
R. F. ChapmanAmicus Curiae
Employers Casualty Company and Texas Employers Insurance AssociationRespondent
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and Bates, et al.Amicus Curiae
Freeman and WolfeAmicus Curiae
Great National Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
State Life Insurance Company, et al.Respondent
Southwestern Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXASRelator
Grover Sellers, Attorney GeneralRespondent
Kansas City Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information