Case: 01-99-01075-CV
01-99-01075-CV
09/27/1999
Injunction
Curtis Swanson, R. Stephen Cavender and Betty Rattan
Community State Bank
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/17/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/17/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
03/26/2000 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
03/11/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
03/09/2000 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
02/25/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
02/10/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed for want of jurisdiction | |
02/10/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed for want of jurisdiction | |
01/19/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/19/2000 | Submission | | |
01/19/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/05/2000 | Motion to reset submission disposed | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
12/30/1999 | Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec | | |
12/30/1999 | Motion to reset submission filed | | |
12/20/1999 | Submission | | |
12/01/1999 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |
11/22/1999 | Brief Due | | |
11/22/1999 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
11/22/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/22/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/28/1999 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | |
10/21/1999 | Brief Due | | |
10/21/1999 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/18/1999 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
10/12/1999 | Motion to dismiss appeal | Motion will be taken with case | |
10/07/1999 | Record has been checked out. | | |
10/06/1999 | Docketing statement filed | | |
10/06/1999 | Record has been checked out. | | |
10/03/1999 | Record due | | |
10/01/1999 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
10/01/1999 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
09/27/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/24/1999 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
09/23/1999 | Appellate filing fee paid. | | |
09/23/1999 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
09/07/1999 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/17/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | |
CURTIS SWANSON, R. STEPHEN CAV | Appellant | Thomas G. Overbeck |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
COMMUNITY STATE BANK | Appellee | Craig R. Denum Boude E. Storey, II |
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable SCOTT REITER LINK
9930628