Case: 06-0471
06-0471
06/09/2006
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
MARY PIDCOCK
CITY OF WICHITA FALLS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/21/2006 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached. | |
06/21/2006 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Mary Pidcock. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/17/2020 | Document received (See Remarks) | Scanned document added from database. | ||
10/19/2006 | Case Stored | G02/9-H-5 | | |
10/09/2006 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | | | |
08/11/2006 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
07/11/2006 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/23/2006 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of The City of Wichita Falls | | |
06/21/2006 | Notice requesting filing fee | $75 fee request sent to Holly Crampton for pet/rev. | ||
06/21/2006 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached. | | |
06/21/2006 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Mary Pidcock. | | |
06/13/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted. Petition for review due n/l/t 5:00 p.m. on 6/19/06. | |
06/12/2006 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Mr. Hegglund, Respondent's counsel, and they opposed the 53.7 motion but will not going to filed opposition | | |
06/12/2006 | Certification (various) in case received | Certificate of conference. On behalf of Mary Pidcock. (1) | | |
06/12/2006 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | requesting a certificate of conference for the 53.7 motion. Spoke with Petitioner's counsel Ms. Holly Crampton. | | |
06/09/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed on behalf of Mary Pidcock | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/19/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/9-H-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Wichita Falls | Respondent | Mr. R. Kinley Hegglund Jr. |
Pidcock, Mary | Petitioner | Ms. Holly Gail Crampton |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-05-00244-CV
Dismissed WOP
___ SW3d ___, 03-16-06
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable Per Curiam
Trial Court Information
89th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Roy T. Sparkman
146,822-C