Case: 06-0468
06-0468
06/08/2006
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS
WILLIAM J. HUGHES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/25/2007 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | Response to mo/re filed on behalf of William J. Hughes. (12) | |
05/11/2007 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing from the Denial of Pet. Rev., filed on behalf of Dallas County, (12) | |
01/26/2007 | Waiver of Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Dallas Co. relies on petition for review perviously filed. (12) | |
01/23/2007 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Respondent's brief on the merits. On behalf of William J. Hughes. | |
10/09/2006 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to pet/rev. On behalf of William J. Hughes. | |
08/09/2006 | Additional citations received. | Petitioner | On behalf of Dallas Co. Pet's would like to bring to Court's attention some new citation. | |
07/20/2006 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition for review. | |
07/20/2006 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Pet. for review filed on behalf of Dallas County, Texas. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/2020 | Document received (See Remarks) | Scanned document added from database. | ||
11/17/2020 | Document received (See Remarks) | Scanned document added from database. | ||
09/21/2007 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Record returned to the Court of Appeals | | |
09/21/2007 | Case Stored | G02 Row 5 C-2 | | |
09/07/2007 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
08/24/2007 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
08/08/2007 | Notice from Counsel of a change in address | Notice of change of address for attys., Kirk L. Pittard and F. Leighton Durham III. (1) (updated in cm) | | |
06/25/2007 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Response to mo/re filed on behalf of William J. Hughes. (12) | | |
06/14/2007 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to motion for rehearing due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 6/29/07; mlbx rule d/n/a | ||
05/15/2007 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/14/2007 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of William J. Hughes. (12) | | |
05/11/2007 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing from the Denial of Pet. Rev., filed on behalf of Dallas County, (12) | | |
04/27/2007 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
02/23/2007 | Case Record Filed | Inventory in remarks | | |
02/06/2007 | Electronic copies of brief posted to website | #06046803 Respondent's Brief on the Merits | ||
01/26/2007 | Waiver of Brief on the Merits | Dallas Co. relies on petition for review perviously filed. (12) | | |
01/24/2007 | Call received | From pet's atty , Dallas County stating why they did not file a pet's brief on the merits. He asked if he should have filed some sort of letter or motion. I directed him to BH. | | |
01/23/2007 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent's brief on the merits. On behalf of William J. Hughes. | ||
01/18/2007 | Electronic copies of brief posted to website | #06046802 Petition for Review 7/20/06 | ||
12/14/2006 | Electronic copies of brief posted to website | #06046801 Response to Petition 10/9/06 | ||
12/07/2006 | Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates | Vacation notice for Coyt Randal Johnston. He will be on vacation 5/3-19/07. | | |
12/05/2006 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | | | |
12/04/2006 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Pet br due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 1/3/07; Rsp br due 1/23/07; Reply br due 2/7/07; mlbx rule d/n/a | ||
10/09/2006 | Response to Petition | Response to pet/rev. On behalf of William J. Hughes. | ||
09/07/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed m/e/t to file requested response to petition granted. Requested response due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 10/11/06; mlbx rule d/n/a | |
09/05/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed m/e/t to file response to pet/rev. On behalf of William J. Hughes. | | |
08/11/2006 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response requested to petition for review due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 9/11/06; mlbx rule d/n/a | ||
08/09/2006 | Additional citations received. | On behalf of Dallas Co. Pet's would like to bring to Court's attention some new citation. | | |
07/25/2006 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/24/2006 | Letter Filed | Letter from respondent directed to petitioner asking if they would please correct their address for resp's. Resp's have been notifying pet's of new address since 11/5/05. On behalf of William Hughes. | | |
07/24/2006 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of WILLIAM J. HUGHES | | |
07/20/2006 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition for review. | | |
07/20/2006 | Petition for Review | Pet. for review filed on behalf of Dallas County, Texas. | ||
06/21/2006 | Address Change | Address change for resp's atty Mr. Coyt Johnston and Robert Tobey. Updated CM. | | |
06/09/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted. Petition for review due n/l/t 5:00 p.m. on 7/21/06. | |
06/08/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | m/e/t to file pet/rev. On behalf Dallas County, Texas. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
09/21/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 5 C-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hughes, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Coyt (Randy) R. Johnston Mr. Frederick Leighton Durham III Mr. Robert L. Tobey Mr. Kirk L. Pittard |
Dallas County, Texas | Petitioner | Mr. Eric G. Walraven Mrs. Daon M. Ward Mr. Grant Hugh Brenna Mr. Robert L. Schell Mr. Donald E. Godwin Mr. William T. Hill Mr. Craig M. Watkins |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-05-00508-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
189 SW3d 886, 02-28-06
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Amos Louis Mazzant
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
04-11939-K