judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER VS. BEEBE

Case Information: 34732
Short Caption:TURNER VS. BEEBECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D216803Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/19/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08004
08/26/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/07/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Richard Turner-cashier's check no. 2015871917.
09/07/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Forwarded cashier's check no. 2015871916 in the amount of $24.00 to Clark County Clerk.
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10424
11/19/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 99-11536
11/19/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00537
02/15/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person document received from appellant.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-02345
03/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 00-03265
03/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/27/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 7, 2000. 00-03265
06/01/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Duty of Counsel.
10/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 21, 2000, the clerk of this court received from appellant a check for copying fees and a fifth letter again requesting "documentation for respondent." On June 22, 2000, the clerk mailed to appellant copies of all documents which the clerk received or filed in this appeal. Since that time, appellant has submitted seven letters seeking additional documents. As this court has already sent Mr. Turner copies of all documents regarding this appeal which were filed or received by the clerk of this court, we are unable to assist Mr. Turner any further at this time. No action will be taken in regard to the seven letters received from Mr. Turner. The clerk of this court shall immediately return, unfiled, any future letters or documents received from appellant Turner regarding this appeal. 00-18646