judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust,

Case Heading (06-239)
Case Number:06-239Case Docketed On:10/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust,
Full Title:COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantColorado Casualty Insurance CompanyJohn Anthony Coppede
Brian J. Spano
Stephen E. Csajaghy
AppelleeDonald L. SammonsJames W. Britt
Cathleen H. Heintz
Alan Epstein

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 75
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/17/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice and entry of appearance (Chris A. Mattison, Cathlee H. Heintz and Alan Epstein) for appelleesMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
11/20/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Mattison, Heintz and Epstein.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
11/30/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice (Brian Spano and Stephen Csajaghy for appellant)MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
12/01/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allow (Spano and Csajaghy)OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/04/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs - appellantNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
01/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on cd and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
02/02/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes: Volumes I through V, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John C. Coppede and Brian J. Spano, argument by Mr. Spano for appellant; James W. Britt and Cathleen Heintz, argument by Ms. Heintz) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/10/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/29/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal