judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: VICTOIRE FRANCOIS-EUGENE; LAURA FRANCOIS-EUGENE, APLT

Case Information: 10-PR-0774
Short Caption:IN RE: VICTOIRE FRANCOIS-EUGENE; LAURA FRANCOIS-EUGENE, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT21-05Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/24/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLaura Francois-Eugene NPro SeN
AppelleeVictoire Francois-Eugene NPro SeN
AppelleePaule Levadas NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 17, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
07/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/26/10) (elp)
08/26/2010 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (25-pgs/tape 5/26/10 proc.)w/cd attached
09/01/2010APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to court's order re: transcript
09/01/2010RECORD INDEX
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/18/2010APPENDIX- aplt
11/23/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on October 18, 2010. and it further appearing that the briefs of appellees were due to be filed on or before November 22, 201(See D.C. App. R. 31), but the briefs have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit their briefs, or a statement that the party will not be filing a brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or statement, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and the appellant's brief alone. (JAC) elp
12/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 23, 2010, which directed appeals to submit their briefs within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the briefs have not yet been filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) elp
12/17/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/12/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/12/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Fisher, Belson, Steadman
05/18/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, and Belson and Steadman, Senior Judges.)
06/24/2011MANDATE ISSUED