Case: 14-03-00434-CR
14-03-00434-CR
04/14/2003
Fraudulent Destr., Removal, or Conceal. of Writing
Wickboldt, Robert Richard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/24/2003 | Case stored | | |||
05/26/2003 | Supplemental clerk's record DUE | | |||
05/22/2003 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
05/19/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/08/2003 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
05/08/2003 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||
05/08/2003 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | | ||
05/07/2003 | Submitted | | |||
05/07/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/02/2003 | Docketing statement DUE | | |||
04/30/2003 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |||
04/29/2003 | Letter RECEIVED | | |||
04/28/2003 | Clerk's Record DUE | | |||
04/24/2003 | No description available. | | |||
04/22/2003 | Letter RECEIVED | | |||
04/22/2003 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
04/17/2003 | Clerks Certification Letter Sent | | |||
04/14/2003 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
03/26/2003 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |||
02/26/2003 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/19/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore, III |
Wickboldt, Robert Richard | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Richard Wickboldt |
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable Denise Collins
899,080
4yrs TDCJ