Case: 14-95-00976-CR
14-95-00976-CR
08/22/1995
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Cole, Keith Milo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/18/1996 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/18/1997 | Case stored | | |
02/03/1997 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
02/03/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/03/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/20/1997 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
01/03/1997 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
01/03/1997 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
12/19/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
12/19/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
12/17/1996 | Submitted | | |
12/17/1996 | Submission | | |
12/17/1996 | Submitted | | |
08/02/1996 | Past due brief | | |
07/23/1996 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
07/18/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/18/1996 | Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
07/18/1996 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief | | |
07/18/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/11/1996 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/03/1996 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/24/1996 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
06/24/1996 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/06/1996 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
05/28/1996 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/26/1996 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
05/02/1996 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/29/1996 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/26/1996 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/29/1996 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
03/29/1996 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
03/07/1996 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
02/29/1996 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
02/29/1996 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
01/11/1996 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
01/02/1996 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
12/29/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
11/27/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
11/02/1995 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
10/27/1995 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
09/28/1995 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
09/25/1995 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
09/25/1995 | Record due | | |
09/25/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
09/22/1995 | Transcript FILED | | |
08/22/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/18/1995 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
07/26/1995 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/03/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/13/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes, Jr. |
COLE, KEITH MILO | Criminal - Appellant | Allen C. Isbell |
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
94-02136
Life TDC