judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN DAVID MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-238)
Case Number:06-238Case Docketed On:10/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:JOHN DAVID MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN DAVID MARTINEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn David MartinezDiane M. Lozano
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 164
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - breif of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/05/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
03/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Errata - brief of appellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
03/23/2007Motion - Supplement the record (motion for volunary dismissal of appeal in Docket No. 05-262, and order dismissing).MotionSupplement the recordFinal
04/11/2007Order - Grant - motion to supplement the record.OrderGrantFinal
04/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/23/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/07/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes total: Dist. Ct. No. 27--283 Volume I, original papers, Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder; Dist.Ct. No. 27-946, Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/02/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/7/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal