judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANN MARIE ADAMS V. CRISTINA PAYNE

Case Information: 10-FM-0771
Short Caption:ANN MARIE ADAMS V. CRISTINA PAYNEClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO2782-09Filed Date:06/15/2010

Opening Event Date:06/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnn Marie Adams YPro SeN
AppellantCristina Payne NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (See NOA date stamp)
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 15, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
07/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 3/24/09 1/12/10 4/19/09 2/27/10 7/28/09 6/8/10 8/10/09 7/17/10 9/28/09 (rt. needed) 10/8/09 11/16/09
10/26/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the of this order, file a motion and fully completed financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24(3), or tender the $100 fee. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is F/O that this matter remains in abeynace pending further order of this court. (ETW)
10/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/03/2010ORDER DENY W/O PREJUDICE APLT MO TO PROCEED IFP to its renewal within 10 calendar days from the date of this order by filing a fully completed motion and financial information statement or tender the $100 fee. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this appeal witthout further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
12/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/17/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion and financial insormation statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, and it appearing that appellant is requesting transcirpts for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is granted. However, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, appellant must file a motion with the Court Reporting Division for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (dlm)
01/14/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript
01/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 8/12/09 1/13/10 8/25/09 3/2/10 9/15/09 6/14/10 10/7/09 (rt. needed) 11/16/09 1/8/09 1/11/10
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 1/8/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 1/11/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (36 pgs/tape) 3/2/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (100 pgs/tape) 6/14/10 proc. w/cd
02/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/28/2011RECORD INDEX
02/28/2011RECORD COPIES
03/03/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 3, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 22, 2011. (JAC)
07/29/2011FiledOrder directing appellant's brief within 15 days from date of order
08/26/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/26/2011FiledDismissed
09/15/2011FiledReceived order dated 8/26/11 sent to petitioner returned from post office marked "moved, left no address." (Appellant Adams)
09/23/2011FiledMandate