Case: 13-03-00296-CR
13-03-00296-CR
05/20/2003
Robbery
TELESFORO TORRES
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/14/2004 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
07/07/2004 | Record Sent | | |||
07/06/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
04/15/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
04/15/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Denied as Moot | | ||
04/02/2004 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
03/24/2004 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
03/15/2004 | Letter sent | | |||
03/09/2004 | request for documents | | |||
02/20/2004 | Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal | | |||
02/10/2004 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
01/14/2004 | Green card in | | |||
01/12/2004 | Order Entered | | |||
05/21/2003 | Tex. R. App. P. 37.1 | | |||
05/20/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/06/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Torres, Telesforo | Appellant | Telesforo Torres Hon. Gene A. Garcia |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Patrick L. Flanigan |
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Joel B. Johnson
S-03-3024-CR
10 Yrs TDC