judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH HUNTINGTON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-237)
Case Number:06-237Case Docketed On:10/16/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:KEITH HUNTINGTON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: KEITH HUNTINGTON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith HuntingtonDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 124
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/16/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/16/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2006Brief - Appellant; ;and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/12/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk. Received copy of designation of record on 1/18/07.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/01/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/03/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/13/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/28/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/30/07 by Laura Tueller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal