judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERNEST W. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0768
Short Caption:ERNEST W. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CF-0491 Consolidated:10-CO-0768
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-12704-08Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/2010
Argued/Submitted:11/23/2010
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErnest W. Thomas YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Dorann E. Banks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CF-491 and 10-CO-768 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that David H. Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-768. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-768 to this court forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief, addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-768 shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be field within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
07/27/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CO-768)
07/27/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CO-768)
07/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/25/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (10-CO-768)
08/25/2010APPENDIX (10-CO-768)
09/29/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
09/29/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/18/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (10-CO-768)
11/10/2010MEMORANDUM Atty Listerman will argue in place of Atty Becker.
11/23/2010FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/23/2010ARGUED before Ruiz,Fisher,Farrell. David H.Reiter Esq.,for appellant. Helenanne Listerman Esq.,for appellee.
04/12/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired,* and Farrell, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
04/18/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/18/2012FiledMotion for appointment to file writ of certiorari (Appellant)Granted
05/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for appointmetn of counsel.
05/04/2012FiledMandate
07/16/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/09/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)