judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-108
A-108
03/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
JACOB I. RODRIGUEZ
TERRELL WELLS SWIMMING POOL AND HENRY E. STUMBERG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/14/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/05/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/08/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/14/1944Supplemental Brief filed
07/05/1944Brief in Support of Petition
05/08/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/29/1944Response to Petition
03/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lang, Byrd, Cross and LadonAmicus Curiae
Jacob I. RodriguezPetitioner
Terrell Wells Swimming Pool and Henry E. StumbergRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information