judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEINBERG VS. T.R. NOYE, INC.

Case Information: 34733
Short Caption:STEINBERG VS. T.R. NOYE, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401326Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 4484.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08005
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/07/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 10, 1999, July 12, 1999, July 28, 1999 and August 9, 1999. To Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 99-08346
10/07/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-09672
11/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. After a second settlement conference, the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11069
11/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11168
12/01/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement; 30 days for Court Reporter Dina Dalton to prepare and complete the transcrit requested by appellants pursuant to the transcript request filed September 7, 1999; 100 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-11980
12/16/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12725
03/10/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/9/00. 00-03785
03/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 00-03786
04/10/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/7/00. 00-05655
05/09/2000Order/Procedural Order. Court reporter Dalton shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts for proceedings conducted on May 10, 1999, July 12, 1999, July 28, 1999, and August 9, 1999. 00-07584
05/09/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/8/00. 00-07632
05/30/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/10/99, 7/12/99, 7/28/99, 8/9/99. Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 00-09094
05/30/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Dina Dalton re: filing of transcripts in district court. 00-09096
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20528
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNPOOA-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the district court's order confirming the arbitration award." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02461
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02582
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02582