judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE E. BRYSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0775
Short Caption:GEORGE E. BRYSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2984-09Filed Date:05/10/2010

Opening Event Date:05/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge E. Bryson Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Walter Booth, Esquire, is he reby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Walter Booth, Esquire
07/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (156pgs/Jeon) 5/3-4/10 proc. w/CD attached
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/08/2010RECORD COPIES
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 24, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/01/2011ORDER DENY APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL without prejudice to its renewal accompanied by a statement of appellant pro se in accordance with the requirements of Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file a new motion to withdraw this appeal, or the brief and limited appendix. (By: ETW)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/waiver attached
03/02/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). (By: ETW)
03/02/2011DISMISSED
03/14/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER (Notice from counsel Qualls letter forwarded to Appellant)
03/23/2011MANDATE ISSUED