Case: 01-04-00648-CR
01-04-00648-CR
06/07/2004
Murder
Edwin Escobedo
The State of Texas
No
8th Court of Appeals
07/14/2004
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/21/2006 | Inmate correspondence | | |
08/02/2004 | Record due | | |
07/15/2004 | Inserted for Envelope generation. | | |
07/14/2004 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
06/07/2004 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
06/03/2004 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
06/03/2004 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. William J. Delmore III |
Escobedo, Edwin | Appellant | Winifred Akins Pastorini |
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Hon. Mike Anderson
953095
50 Years TDC