Case: 05-01-01790-CR
05-01-01790-CR
11/15/2001
Aggravated Robbery
Ward, Levi
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/24/2005 | Record Returned | | |
08/18/2005 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/03/2005 | Motion to Withdraw Record | | |
04/22/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/22/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/25/2003 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
02/26/2003 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
01/15/2003 | File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
01/13/2003 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/13/2003 | Record Shipped | | |
01/06/2003 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
12/30/2002 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
10/30/2002 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/30/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/30/2002 | Record Retention | Retain | |
09/30/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/11/2002 | Submitted | | |
09/11/2002 | Submission | | |
09/11/2002 | Submitted | | |
07/08/2002 | Submission | | |
04/21/2002 | Brief Due | | |
04/15/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
04/15/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/15/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/22/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
03/22/2002 | Brief Due | | |
02/20/2002 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
01/25/2002 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
01/06/2002 | Record due | | |
01/04/2002 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/04/2002 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
11/15/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
11/15/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/15/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/07/2001 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
11/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/22/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Susan Tabea | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 204th District Court |
Ann Meredith | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Anne B. Meredith |
Levi Ward | Criminal - Appellant | John G Tatum |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Laura Anne Coats William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F01-49743-PQ
28 Yrs