Case: 03-91-00195-CV
03-91-00195-CV
05/10/1991
Unknown Civil Case Type.
The State of Texas
Linda Morales, Tom Doyal, Patricia Cramer, Charlotte Taft and John Thomas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/1996 | CASE STORED | | |
09/12/1994 | Exhibits destroyed | | |
03/04/1994 | Filing fee unpaid in Ct. of Appeals | | |
03/04/1994 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |
02/18/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/09/1992 | Application Writ Sup Ct Granted | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/22/1992 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction | |
05/12/1992 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
05/11/1992 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | | |
05/08/1992 | Petition for writ of mandamus | | |
04/08/1992 | Correction filed | | |
04/08/1992 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
03/26/1992 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
03/11/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/03/1992 | Post-submission brief filed | | |
01/29/1992 | Brief received, not filed | | |
01/29/1992 | Submitted | | |
01/29/1992 | Submission | | |
01/27/1992 | Brief received, not filed | | |
01/23/1992 | Brief received, not filed | | |
01/22/1992 | Brief received, not filed | | |
01/06/1992 | Brief received, not filed | | |
11/21/1991 | Motion to Substitute Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/14/1991 | Motion to Substitute Filed | | |
11/12/1991 | Submission | | |
07/24/1991 | Brief filed | | |
07/24/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/19/1991 | Exhibits filed | | |
07/19/1991 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
07/18/1991 | Mt file Supp Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/17/1991 | Mt file Supplemental Record Filed | | |
07/10/1991 | miscellaneous motion disp | Dismissed | |
07/05/1991 | Brief received, not filed | | |
07/05/1991 | miscellaneous motion filed | | |
07/05/1991 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/03/1991 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/11/1991 | Brief received, not filed | | |
06/10/1991 | Brief filed | | |
05/10/1991 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/10/1991 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/10/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/18/1991 | Statement of Facts Received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/18/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Doyal, Tom | Appellee | Mr. J. Patrick Wiseman |
Morales, Linda | Appellee | Mr. J. Patrick Wiseman |
The State Of Texas | Appellant | Mr. Harry G. Potter III |
Cramer, Patricia | Appellee | Mr. J. Patrick Wiseman |
Taft, Charlotte | Appellee | Mr. J. Patrick Wiseman |
Thomas, John | Appellee | Mr. J. Patrick Wiseman |
Texas Human Rights Foundation | Appellee | Ms. Pamela C. Oglesby |
Trial Court Information
200th District Court
Travis
461,898