Case: 07-99-00381-CV
07-99-00381-CV
09/21/1999
Miscellaneous civil
White, Betty; David White
Rick Canup Relators, Inc. d/b/a Coldwell Banker, Rick Canup Relators, Inc., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/03/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/15/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
03/23/2000 | Submitted | | |||
03/23/2000 | Submission | | |||
03/01/2000 | Submission | | |||
01/07/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/07/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/16/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
12/15/1999 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | | ||
11/15/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/14/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
09/24/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
09/21/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
09/21/1999 | Notice of Docketing Statement - CV | | |||
09/21/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/03/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rick Canup Relators, Inc. * | Appellee | Eric G. Walraven |
White, Betty; David White | Appellant | Terrell M. Thompson |
Margaret Williams, Relators | Appellee | Matt D. Matzner |
William Arthur Bradshaw | Appellee | Billy R. Wolfe |
Margaret Williams Relato ** | Appellee | William J. Wade |
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
98-503,552