Case: A-112
A-112
03/21/1944
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
CHAS. M. COCKE, INDEPENDENT TESTAMENTARY EXECUTOR
JOSIE BIRR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/21/1944 | Certified Question filed | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/15/1944 | Letter Filed | | ||
04/28/1944 | Letter Filed | | ||
04/01/1944 | Letter Filed | | ||
03/28/1944 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
03/21/1944 | Certified Question filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Josie Birr | Respondent | |
Chas. M. Cocke, Independent Testamentary Executor | Relator |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information