judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. BROWN V. 1401 NEW YORK AVENUE, INC. ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0769
Short Caption:JAMES E. BROWN V. 1401 NEW YORK AVENUE, INC. ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC2807-05Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/13/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/16/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantE. E. Brown N
Tilman L. GeraldYY
Appellee1401 New York Aveune Inc.N
Michelle L. Schaefer YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/12/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 18, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
07/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/5/09 & 10/26/09) (elp)
08/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (246-pgs/hawkins 10/5/09 proc.)
08/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (134-pgs/ransom-jones 10/26/09 proc.)w/cd
08/13/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App.R. 31. (JAC) elp
08/23/2010RECORD INDEX
09/24/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/24/2010APPENDIX
10/27/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF (1401 New York Ave)
11/03/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant and appendix were filed with this court on September 24, 2010, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee Travis Murrell was due to be filed on or before October 29, 2010, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee Travis Murrell shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (JAC) elp
11/24/2010APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to order dated 11/3/10
12/16/2010 On consideration of the response of counsel for appellee Travis Murrell to this court's order of November 3, 2010, and it appearing that Travis Murrell is not a party to this appeal, it is ORDEREd that appellee Travis Murrell is hereby dismissed as a party to this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (ETW) elp
12/16/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/20/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/20/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Thompson, Oberly, Nebeker
08/04/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Thompson and Oberly, associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
08/26/2011FiledMandate