judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHELTON VS. PEREZ

Case Information: 34729
Short Caption:SHELTON VS. PEREZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385521Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd.--check no. 11041.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07992
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10026
11/17/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11417
12/06/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12140
12/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12148
01/26/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. 00-01277
01/31/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." SNP/CLK 00-01498
01/31/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.