Case: PD-0066-03
PD-0066-03
01/15/2003
PDR Case Type
DOOLEY, SAMUEL WADE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/25/2010 | COPY REQUEST | | |
03/26/2004 | REHEAR DISP – PDR | DENIED | |
06/05/2003 | REHEAR FILED PDR | | |
06/05/2003 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/05/2003 | INMATE CORRESPONDENCE | Refused | |
06/02/2003 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
05/12/2003 | REHEAR EXT MOT | Granted | |
05/12/2003 | REHEAR EXT MOTION | | |
03/28/2003 | REHEAR EXT MOT | Granted | |
03/28/2003 | REHEAR EXT MOTION | | |
03/28/2003 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | DENIED | |
03/07/2003 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | | |
01/22/2003 | PDR DISP | Untimely Filed | |
01/22/2003 | PDR DISP | Untimely Filed | |
01/15/2003 | PDR FILED | | |
01/15/2003 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/2004 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
DOOLEY, SAMUEL WADE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | SAMUEL WADE DOOLEY |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Bill Hill |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-01-01914-CR
AFF 10-16-02
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
204th District Court
Dallas
Honorable MARK NANCARROW
F-0152462-HQ