judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS. STINNETT

Case Information: 34730
Short Caption:PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS. STINNETTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A365471Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael H. Singer, Ltd.--check no. 13941.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07995
08/30/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/8/99 to 7/9/99. To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 99-08088
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-10961
11/08/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-10962
11/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. 99-11238
11/30/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK 99-11905
11/30/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.