judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAMANNE MANAGEMENT,INC., ETAL V. HCP LIFE SCIENCE ASSETS TRS

Case Information: 10-CV-0770
Short Caption:CAMANNE MANAGEMENT,INC., ETAL V. HCP LIFE SCIENCE ASSETS TRSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0674 Consolidated:10-CV-0770, 10-CV-0821
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4024-08Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/27/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeCamanne Management Inc.N
Jonathan P. Guy NN
Roger Frankel NN
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeWpi-247 Inc.N
Jonathan P. Guy NN
Roger Frankel NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantHcp Life Science Assets Tre LLc.N
Aaron M. Panner YN
Mark C. Hansen NN
Wan J. Kim NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantHcp Estate Usa Inc.N
Aaron M. Panner NN
Mark C. Hansen NN
Wan J. Kim NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/23/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that transcripts needed for appeals no. 10-CV-674, and 10-CV-770, have been filed in appeal no. 10-CV-674, and it further appearing that no transcripts is needed for appeal no. 10-CV-821, and appellants/cross-appellees' consent motion to supplement the record, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-674, 10-CV-770, and 10-CV-821 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
08/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellants/cross-appellees' is granted and the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the item(s) specified in appellants/cross-appellee's motion to this court as a supplemental record. It is (MORE)
08/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellees/cross-appellants, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellants/cross-appelles; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellees/cross-appellants, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellants/cross-appellees. (ETW) elp)
08/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#13 (exhibit A. (transcript 11/16/09 and exhibit 69)
09/14/2010MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (E. Joshua Rosenkranz) Granted
09/14/2010APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed) dwm
09/14/2010APPEARANCE of Jonathan P. Guy as retained counsel on behalf of aplt Camanne Mgt, Inc.
09/14/2010APPEARANCE of Roger Frankel as retained counsel on behalf of aplt Camanne Mgt, Inc.
09/16/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AND notice of substitution aplt cross aple Granted
09/21/2010 On consideration of the motion of Dale A. Cooter, Esquire, and Donna S. Mangold, Esquire, to withdraw their appearances as counsel of record for appellants/cross-appellees and to enter the appearances of Roger Frankel and Johnathan P. Guy, Esquire, and appellants/cross-appellees' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendx, and the motion of E. Joshua Rosenkranz, Esquire, requesting that his appearance be entered pro hac vice on behalf of appellants/cross-appellees, it is ORDERED that the motion of Dale A. Cooter, Esquire, and Donna S. Mangold, Esquire, is granted and their appearances are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for appellants/cross-appellees and the Clerk shall enter the appearances of Roger Frankel, Esquire, and Jonathan P. Guy, Esquire, as the new counsel for record for appellants/cross-appellees. It is (MORE)
09/21/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the appellants/cross- appellees' motion for an extension of time is granted and the brief and appendix shall be filed with this court on before November 3, 2010. It is (MORE)
09/21/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of E. Joshua Rosenkranz, Esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter his appearances pro hac vice on behalf of appellants/cross-appellees. (ETW) elp
11/03/2010APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF IN RM O47A SHELF BK3 & BK4
11/03/2010APPENDIX (volume I - VI)
11/23/2010APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Joint Motion)
11/29/2010 On consideration of appellees/cross- appellants and appellants/cross-appellees' joint motion for an extension of time to file remaining briefs, ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees/cross-appellants' brief shall be filed on or before December 17, 2010, appellants/cross- appellees' reply brief shall be filed on or before January 14, 2011, and appellees/cross- appellants' reply brief shall be filed on or before February 11, 2011. (JAC) elp
12/17/2010APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/17/2010APLE-X-APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file supplement appendix no oppo
12/17/2010RECEIVED- aple's cross aplt supplemental appendix
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellees/cross- appellants' unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged supplemental appendix, it is ORDERED that the appellees/cross-appellants' motion is granted and the lodged supplemental appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants/cross- appellees' reply brief remains due to be filed with this court on or before January 14, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/05/2011APPENDIX - SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX (APPELLEES/CROSS-APPELLANTS)
01/14/2011APPELLANT-CROSS-APPELLEE REPLY BRIEF
02/04/2011APPELLEE-CROSS-APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF
02/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of May 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by MAR. 25, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
03/29/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt/aple
06/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (JOINT) (elp)
07/05/2011 On consideration of the joint motion to dismiss appeal filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and these appeals are hereby dismissed and each party to bear its own costs. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
07/05/2011DISMISSED
07/27/2011FiledMandate