Case: PD-0252-03
PD-0252-03
04/09/2003
PDR Case Type
GARZA, OZIEL GONZALEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/20/2003 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/04/2003 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/09/2003 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
04/09/2003 | PDR FILED | | |
04/09/2003 | PDR FILED | | |
02/10/2003 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | |
02/10/2003 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/20/2003 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. |
GONZALES, OZIEL GARZA | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | David Cunningham |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-01-01099-CR
AFF 12-27-02
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable JON N. HUGHES
883681