Case: 99-0987
99-0987
10/06/1999
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CARL C. DAVIS, JR., M.D. and CARL C. DAVIS, JR., M.D., P.A.
THE METHODIST HOSPITAL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1999 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Carl C. Davis, Jr. M. D. reply to response | |
11/08/1999 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of The Methodist Hospital | |
10/06/1999 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behlaf of Carl C. Davis, Jr. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | to CoA, via USPS | | |
04/10/2000 | Case Stored | 32-E-1 | | |
12/09/1999 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
12/06/1999 | Reply to Response | Carl C. Davis, Jr. M. D. reply to response | | |
11/09/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/08/1999 | Response to Petition | On behalf of The Methodist Hospital | | |
10/06/1999 | Appendix to any instrument | (attached to petition) | | |
10/06/1999 | Petition for Review | On behlaf of Carl C. Davis, Jr. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 32-E-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
DAVIS, JR., M.D., CARL C. | Petitioner | Mr. Tom F. Coleman III |
THE METHODIST HOSPITAL | Respondent | Ms. Gwen J. Samora Mr. Paul E. Stallings |
DAVIS, JR., M.D., P.A., CARL C | Petitioner | Mr. Raul Herman Suazo |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-98-00419-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
4 SW3d 389, 10-01-99
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable TIM TAFT
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable David M. Medina