Case: 01-1101
01-1101
11/14/2001
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
SHEFFIELD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC.
CITY OF GLENN HEIGHTS, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/2002 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of City of Glenn Heights | |
11/14/2001 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached to petition for review on behalf of Sheffield Development Co mpany, Inc. | |
11/14/2001 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | on behalf of Sheffield Development Company, Inc. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2002 | Case Stored | 22-D-2 | | |
04/15/2002 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final order sent to COA | | |
02/28/2002 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
02/13/2002 | Response to Petition | On behalf of City of Glenn Heights | | |
01/14/2002 | Response to petition, motion, etc. due | Response due February 13, 2002. | | |
01/14/2002 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due February 13, 2002. | | |
12/18/2001 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/14/2001 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached to petition for review on behalf of Sheffield Development Co mpany, Inc. | | |
11/14/2001 | Petition for Review | on behalf of Sheffield Development Company, Inc. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/17/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 22-D-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SHEFFIELD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY | Petitioner | Mr. Arthur J. Anderson |
CITY OF GLENN HEIGHTS, TEXAS | Respondent | Mr. Robert F. Brown |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-00-01238-CV
Reversed and Remanded
55 SW3d 158, 08-09-01
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JAMES A. MOSELEY
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
DV99-09321-K