judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERGUSON (JASPER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34723
Short Caption:FERGUSON (JASPER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981829Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07981
09/23/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09075
09/23/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-09077
10/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09847
10/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix. 99-09848
12/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-12126
12/09/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Order Directing the District Court to Set Bail Pending Resolution of Appellant's Direct Appeal. 99-12393
12/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition for Order Directing District Court to Set Bail. 99-12902
01/18/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/13/00. 00-00811
01/26/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 1/25/00. 00-01278
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering findings of fact and conclusions of law setting forth its reasons for denying appellant bail pending appeal. The district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order to enter its findings. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court. 00-02069
02/22/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re: Denial of Bail Pending Appeal filed in district court on 2/17/00. 00-02749
02/23/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 17, 2000. 00-02843
02/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. John Reese Petty, Chief Deputy, hereby elects not to file a Reply Brief. 00-03084
04/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny appellant's motion for bail pending appeal. 00-05736
04/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] " . . . we remand this matter to the district court to vacate appellant's conviction for driving while having .10 percent or more by weight of alchohol in the blood and enter an amended judgment of conviction . . . we otherwise affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05826
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07568
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 12, 2000. 00-07568