judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK VALE SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-193)
Case Number:06-193Case Docketed On:08/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:PATRICK VALE SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PATRICK VALE SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick Vale SmithD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 150
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/04/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further extensions will be consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/05/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/21/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/02/2007Correspondence - Incoming from appellant regarding prior representation by Richard Bohling, Albany County Attorney. No action taken.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/09/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts and Pre-Sentence Investigation ReportRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/01/2007Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding decision in his case, and copy of arraignment in County Court in 1996.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/01/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter response to appellant and returned copy of arraignment.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
10/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/10/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/9/07 by Marisa Chavez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/15/2007Correspondence - Incoming other - received petition for rehearing - returned to appellant without filing since untimely.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal