judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD E. BROOKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0763
Short Caption:DONALD E. BROOKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-12975-09Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald E. Brooks Y
Ian A. WilliamsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Suzanne Clement Libby YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ian Williams, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ian WIlliams, Esquire
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
08/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (248 pgs/Hawkins) 4/13-15/10 proc. CD attached
08/26/2010RECORD INDEX
08/26/2010RECORD COPIES
08/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/28/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 7, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
11/18/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Limited Appendix (attached to Brief)
11/23/2010 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (JAC)
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/23/2010APPENDIX (attached to the appellant's brief)
12/20/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 1/27/11 no oppo
12/23/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 27, 2011. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of May 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by MAR. 25, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
04/13/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/07/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/2011FiledARGUED before Glickman,Blackburn-Rigsby,Reid. Ian A.Wiiliams Esq.,for appellant. Suzanne Clement Libby Esq.,for appellee.
06/22/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Reid,* Associate Judge, Retired.)
07/14/2011FiledMandate