Case: 02-03-00096-CV
02-03-00096-CV
04/08/2003
Miscellaneous civil
Dorthy Barrow
Veronica Gomez
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/17/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
05/08/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||
05/07/2003 | Submitted | | |||||
04/11/2003 | Court's letter to parties regarding jurisdiction | | |||||
04/09/2003 | Other Document Received | | |||||
04/08/2003 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/17/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Barrow, Dorthy | Appellant | Dorthy Barrow |
Gomez, Veronica | Appellee | S. Barcus Hunter |
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Bob S. McGrath
342-183884-00