Case: 05-05-00458-CR
05-05-00458-CR
04/04/2005
Ander's
McCoy Sr., James Bell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/06/2007 | Mandate issued | | |
08/13/2007 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | |
08/13/2007 | Record Retention | Retain | |
08/13/2007 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | |
07/05/2007 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
06/29/2007 | Letter Received | | |
04/20/2007 | Submitted | | |
04/20/2007 | Submission | | |
04/20/2007 | Submitted | | |
04/12/2007 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
04/04/2007 | Letter Received | | |
03/09/2007 | Letter Received | | |
03/08/2007 | Submission | | |
03/08/2007 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
02/27/2007 | Letter Received | | |
02/01/2007 | Response to Motion | | |
01/23/2007 | Brief Filed | | |
01/23/2007 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | | |
01/22/2007 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
01/16/2007 | Brief Received | | |
01/16/2007 | Letter Received | | |
01/16/2007 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/01/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/01/2007 | Brief Due | | |
01/01/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/15/2006 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
12/14/2006 | Letter Received | | |
12/02/2006 | Brief Due | | |
11/20/2006 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/16/2006 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/06/2006 | Brief Due | | |
11/02/2006 | Brief Filed | | |
10/30/2006 | Letter Received | | |
10/23/2006 | Objection Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/19/2006 | Letter Received | | |
10/12/2006 | Objection Filed | | |
10/12/2006 | Objection Filed | | |
10/06/2006 | Case reinstated | | |
10/06/2006 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
10/06/2006 | Case reinstated | | |
10/05/2006 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/03/2006 | Letter Received | | |
10/02/2006 | Letter Received | | |
09/26/2006 | Letter Received | | |
09/22/2006 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
09/18/2006 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
09/12/2006 | Letter Received | | |
09/11/2006 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
09/08/2006 | Letter Received | | |
08/18/2006 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/16/2006 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
08/15/2006 | Letter Received | | |
08/08/2006 | Letter Received | | |
07/24/2006 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/24/2006 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/24/2006 | Order Entered | Abated | |
07/24/2006 | Opinion issued | Abated | |
07/24/2006 | Order Entered | Abated | |
07/21/2006 | Letter Received | | |
07/14/2006 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
06/30/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
06/16/2006 | Letter Received | | |
06/05/2006 | Letter Received | | |
05/17/2006 | Mandate issued | | |
04/24/2006 | Submitted | | |
04/24/2006 | Submission | | |
04/24/2006 | Submitted | | |
04/07/2006 | Brief Due | | |
04/06/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
04/03/2006 | Submission | | |
03/10/2006 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/10/2006 | Brief Due | | |
03/08/2006 | Brief Filed | | |
03/08/2006 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
02/10/2006 | Response due | | |
01/24/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Response - Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/20/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Response Filed | | |
01/12/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
01/06/2006 | Letter Received | | |
12/12/2005 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
12/12/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
12/01/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/29/2005 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
11/06/2005 | Brief Due | | |
10/19/2005 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
10/18/2005 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
10/17/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/07/2005 | Brief Filed | | |
10/07/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/06/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/06/2005 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed | | |
10/06/2005 | Brief Received | | |
09/23/2005 | Brief Due | | |
09/06/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/02/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/24/2005 | Brief Due | | |
07/25/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/22/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/21/2005 | Record due | | |
05/04/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
04/06/2005 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
04/04/2005 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
04/04/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/04/2005 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/23/2005 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
03/23/2005 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
03/23/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/17/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James Bell Mccoy Sr. | Criminal - Appellant | Bruce Anton James B. Mccoy, Sr. |
Mary Snider | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Mary Snider |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Craig Watkins Christina O`neil Katherine A. Drew |
James Bell Mccoy | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Henry M. Wade
F02-02115-KV
35 Yrs/$10,000 Fine