judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BORBON (VICTOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34718
Short Caption:BORBON (VICTOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33662
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 30339Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07913
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09567
12/21/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 9. Hand delivered 12/21/99-Reno/Carson Messenger. 99-13001
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19666
12/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19689
12/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 8, 2000. 00-19689