judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WSP, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a WYOMING STEEL PRODUCTS, DAVID W. TREFREN and DAVID W. TREFREN, TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID W. TREFREN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED THE 29TH DAY OF JUNE 1999 v. WYOMING STEEL FABRICATORS AND ERECTORS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (06-192)
Case Number:06-192Case Docketed On:08/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WSP, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a WYOMING STEEL PRODUCTS, DAVID W. TREFREN and DAVID W. TREFREN, TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID W. TREFREN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED THE 29TH DAY OF JUNE 1999 v. WYOMING STEEL FABRICATORS AND ERECTORS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:WSP, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a WYOMING STEEL PRODUCTS, DAVID W. TREFREN and DAVID W. TREFREN, TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID W. TREFREN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED THE 29TH DAY OF JUNE 1999, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. WYOMING STEEL FABRICATORS AND ERECTORS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWSP, Inc., a Wyoming CorporationJames R. Salisbury
Sean Charles Chambers
AppellantDavid W. TrefrenJames R. Salisbury
Sean Charles Chambers
AppelleeWyoming Steel Fabricators and Erectors, Inc., a Wyoming CorporationRyan Justin Schwartz
John E. Masters

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 80
Citation:158 P.3d 651

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/09/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk. Runner presented designation of record on appeal for filing, advised it needs to be filed in the district courtBriefAppellantFinal
10/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/21/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
12/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal; three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (James R. Salisbury and Sean C. Chambers, argument by Mr. Salisbury for appellants; Ryan J. Schwartz for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal