judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC C. DREHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0761
Short Caption:ERIC C. DREHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7051-05Filed Date:06/07/2010

Opening Event Date:06/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/22/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric C. Dreher Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall W/N 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
07/20/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/03/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
08/31/2010 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b)(1). (KRBRNB) (rl)
08/31/2010DISMISSED
09/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED
08/10/2012FiledLetter From (Appellant)
04/18/2014FiledArchived